CLAYESMORE SCHOOL

Charity number: 306214
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SALLY MARGARET WILSON Trustee 12 December 2017 None on record
Fiona Waller Trustee 25 September 2019 None on record
RICHARD SHAW Trustee 12 December 2017 None on record
JANE ELIZABETH HOWARD Trustee 12 December 2017
DORCHESTER CHORAL SOCIETY Charity reporting is up to date
INTERNATIONAL NEEDS UK Charity reporting is up to date
JOHN IGNATIUS ANDREWS LLB Chair None on record
Michael Paul Sussman Trustee 07 November 2018 None on record
FRANCES CLAIR DEEMING Trustee 16 June 2011 None on record
Major General John Stokoe CB,CBE Trustee 16 June 2011
THE DORSET HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
TIM INGRAM Trustee 24 May 2013 None on record
DAVID HAYWOOD Trustee 16 June 2011 None on record
MRS ROSIE STIVEN Trustee None on record