THE INSTITUTE OF DEVELOPMENT STUDIES

Charity number: 306371
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £22.56m £23.07m £23.06m £23.43m £27.56m
Total expenditure £22.22m £21.84m £23.58m £22.76m £24.81m
Income from government contracts £2.11m £3.94m £2.67m £2.31m £1.85m
Income from government grants £5.50m £2.86m £3.66m £5.30m £6.33m
Income - Donations and legacies £29.00k £30.00k £155.00k £102.00k £102.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £22.50m £23.03m £22.88m £23.29m £27.41m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £31.00k £16.00k £20.00k £36.00k £48.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £22.20m £21.80m £23.52m £22.71m £24.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £13.00k £42.00k £52.00k £54.00k £54.00k
Expenditure - Governance £29.00k £22.00k £20.00k £31.00k £23.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0