THE INSTITUTE OF DEVELOPMENT STUDIES

Charity number: 306371
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Esther Mergeana McIntosh Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Professor Frances Stewart Trustee 16 January 2014 None on record
Professor Adam Tickell Trustee 09 September 2016 None on record
PROFESSOR MELISSA LEACH Trustee 23 April 2014 None on record
Professor Deepak Nayyar Chair 01 August 2020 None on record
Dr Anuradha Joshi Trustee 01 August 2019 None on record
Kim Frost Trustee 01 April 2018
THE ARCHITECTURAL ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED) Received: On time
Jenny Natasha Clayton Trustee 01 November 2019
TRANSPARENCY INTERNATIONAL UK Received: On time
NKOYO ESU TOYO Trustee 01 May 2018 None on record
Michael Anderson Trustee 01 August 2016 None on record
Awo Ablo Trustee 04 December 2019 None on record
Mustafa Roberts Trustee 01 August 2019 None on record
Professor Takyiwaa Manuh Trustee 01 August 2016 None on record
DR Ali Cheema Trustee 01 August 2016 None on record