TREVILSON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 306555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 March 2020 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 March 2019 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required