FOWEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 306571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £96.86k £88.71k £87.97k £70.15k £82.98k
Total expenditure £86.60k £82.44k £93.69k £87.02k £82.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A