FOWEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 306571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JONATHAN ROLLS Trustee 13 November 2019 None on record
ANDREW JOHN HARVEY Trustee 17 November 2021 None on record
BENJAMIN MATTHEW EDDY Trustee 29 July 2020 None on record
Christopher James Taylor Trustee 20 September 2017 None on record
Rev PHILIP DE GREY-WARTER Trustee 01 January 2014
PENINSULA GOSPEL PARTNERSHIP Received: 6 days late
ANCHOR ANGLICAN CHURCH FOWEY
THE FOWEY CHARITIES Overdue by 29 days
Anthony William Freshwater Trustee 15 January 2020 None on record
EMMA DOLORES CROSS Trustee 02 November 2020 None on record
NICHOLAS JAMES STEPHENS Trustee 12 May 2016 None on record
Maria Alison Barnes Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record
MR JONATHAN TREFFRY Trustee None on record
Michael William John Bailey Trustee 02 May 2018 None on record
MALCOLM DAVID SUTTON Trustee None on record
PETER JOHN FOUND Chair None on record
HILDA MARSHALL-JOHNSON Trustee 22 September 2016 None on record
ANNIE STUART Trustee 23 September 2015 None on record