DUNHEVED SCHOLARSHIP FUND (IN CONNEXION WITH LAUNCESTON COLLEGE)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to students who have attended Launceston College, and are now studying at Cambridge, Oxford or one of the London Univerities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 23 November 1962: Standard registration
- 15 June 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5 | £4 | £3 | £2 | £2 | |
|
Total expenditure | £750 | £401 | £0 | £225 | £451 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 08 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 04 March 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 19 March 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | 13 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH NOVEMBER 1924
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SCHOLARSHIPS FOR FORMER PUPILS OF LAUNCESTON COLLEGE AT THE UNIVERSITIES OF OXFORD, CAMBRIDGE OR LONDON.
Area of benefit
CORNWALL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window