DYKE EXHIBITION FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation makes awards to students who are undertaking courses in Further Education. The awards are made to assist with fees, accommodation, purchase of books and equipment, or any other expense incurred by the student. Applicants must be resident in Somerset, Devon or Cornwall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 15 October 1962: Standard registration
- 09 December 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 03 October 2011: Re-registered
- 24 January 2020: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 24 January 2020: Funds transferred to 1094446 SOMERSET COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.37k | £4.63k | £3.53k | £2.94k | £2.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.75k | £2.83k | £3.48k | £5.34k | £5.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 11 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 12 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 25 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 15 NOVEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
IN AWARDING TO BENEFICIARIES SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES AND MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES, TENABLE TO ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES. IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST BENEFICIARIES TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR CALLING ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. PROVIDED THAT AWARDS CONSISTING OF THE PAYMENT OF PART PAYMENT OF FEES SHALL BE CALLED DYKE EXHIBITIONS AND THAT A PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE,OR ARE ABOUT TO BECOME UNDERGRADUATES OF OXFORD UNIVERSITY.
Area of benefit
COUNTIES OF CORNWALL, DEVON AND SOMERSET AS CONSTITUTED ON 31 MARCH 1974.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window