THE CITY OF LONDON CORPORATION COMBINED RELIEF OF POVERTY CHARITY

Charity number: 1073660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required