Trustees THE FOUNDATION AND JUBILEE TRUST OF THE KING'S SCHOOL, OTTERY ST MARY

Charity number: 306662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Ellison Chair 18 October 2018
THE ROYAL ARTILLERY CENTRE FOR PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT
Received: On time
Dr Charlotte Kate Hawkins Trustee 03 May 2022
None on record
Jayne Deborah Coppin Trustee 11 January 2022
None on record
DAVID ROBERTS Trustee 30 April 2019
THE OTTERY ST MARY AND DISTRICT HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS
Received: On time
COLERIDGE MEMORIAL TRUST
Overdue by 51 days
Robert John Gammon Trustee 12 September 2016
None on record
Sara Penelope Wilkinson Trustee 14 September 2015
None on record
JOHN MICHAEL LAVENDER Trustee 24 September 2012
ARTHUR HITCHCOCK
Received: On time
IVAN ROULSON Trustee
None on record
ROSEMARY THOMAS Trustee
None on record
LIZ MOWER Trustee
None on record