THE SILVERDALE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT/TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 306959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 07 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 12 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 19 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required