THE SILVERDALE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT/TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 306959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £14.77k £8.61k £16.10k £12.94k £1.71k
Total expenditure £9.97k £20.54k £31.32k £13.34k £3.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A