MAGDALEN AND LASHER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 306969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 November 2016 On time Download