MAGDALEN AND LASHER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 306969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £175.32k £174.97k £180.70k £181.38k £184.86k
Total expenditure £152.09k £166.43k £172.34k £226.46k £169.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A