MAGDALEN AND LASHER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 306969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Judith Helen Cubison Trustee 22 March 2021
THE MAGDALEN AND LASHER CHARITY Received: On time
MAGDALEN & LASHER CHARITY - OLD HASTINGS HOUSE, CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION Received: On time
Gareth Nicholas Bendon Trustee
TWO TOWERS TRUST Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF SAINT CLEMENT AND ALL SAINTS HASTINGS.
THE MAGDALEN AND LASHER CHARITY Received: On time
ANN WING Trustee 13 September 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF SAINT CLEMENT AND ALL SAINTS HASTINGS.
THE MAGDALEN AND LASHER CHARITY Received: On time
MAGDALEN & LASHER CHARITY - OLD HASTINGS HOUSE, CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION Received: On time
IAN MICHAEL STEEL Trustee
THE WILLIAM SHADWELL CHARITY Received: On time
THE MAGDALEN AND LASHER CHARITY Received: On time
MAGDALEN & LASHER CHARITY - OLD HASTINGS HOUSE, CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION Received: On time
CLIVE GALBRAITH Chair 26 July 2013
THE MAGDALEN AND LASHER CHARITY Received: On time
MAGDALEN & LASHER CHARITY - OLD HASTINGS HOUSE, CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION Received: On time
John Bilsby Trustee 16 January 2020
THE MAGDALEN AND LASHER CHARITY Received: On time
MAGDALEN & LASHER CHARITY - OLD HASTINGS HOUSE, CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION Received: On time
Rev Paul Hunt Trustee 22 March 2021
THE MAGDALEN AND LASHER CHARITY Received: On time
MAGDALEN & LASHER CHARITY - OLD HASTINGS HOUSE, CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION Received: On time
Cllr James Bacon Trustee 14 July 2016
THE MAGDALEN AND LASHER CHARITY Received: On time
MAGDALEN & LASHER CHARITY - OLD HASTINGS HOUSE, CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION Received: On time
Keith Stuart Donaldson Trustee
THE MAGDALEN AND LASHER CHARITY Received: On time
SUE PHILLIPS Trustee
THE MAGDALEN AND LASHER CHARITY Received: On time
Dr Patricia Lock Trustee 14 July 2016
THE MAGDALEN AND LASHER CHARITY Received: On time
MAGDALEN & LASHER CHARITY - OLD HASTINGS HOUSE, CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION Received: On time
MICHAEL JABEZ FOSTER Trustee
THE FAIRLIGHT ARTS TRUST Received: On time
THE MAGDALEN AND LASHER CHARITY Received: On time