Accounts and annual returns THE GIRLS' DAY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 306983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 15 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 23 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window