Trustees THE GIRLS' DAY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 306983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Giselle Vidic Cattorini Trustee 28 September 2022
None on record
Poppy Scott Plummer Trustee 28 September 2022
None on record
Carolyn Jane Aitchison Trustee 28 September 2022
None on record
HILARY ANN EWING Trustee 24 September 2019
None on record
Stuart Ross Trustee 20 March 2019
None on record
ANNE VICTORIA TUCK Trustee 01 September 2017
WESTMINSTER SCHOOL SCHOLARSHIP AND BURSARY FUND
Received: On time
FRASER MONTGOMERY Trustee 05 July 2017
None on record
PETER GEOFFREY OLIVER Trustee 05 July 2017
None on record
Maria Gordon Trustee 06 July 2016
None on record
KATHRYN DAVIS Trustee 16 December 2015
None on record