TEMPLE GROVE SCHOOLS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's general object is the advancement of education of children and students. The charity is sponsor of Temple Grove Academy Trust, which runs Temple Grove Academy in Tunbridge Wells; and has endowed the primary phases of 3 academies in south east London in partnership with the Haberdashers' Aske's Federation. It seeks other opportunities in primary education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Sussex
- Kent
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 25 March 1963: Standard registration
- TEMPLE GROVE SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Kenrick Grosvenor PRESCOT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alexander Philip Clark | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Denoon Duncan | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Child-Villiers | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
SIMON NICHOLAS LOUGH | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alanna Yvette LEE | Trustee | 04 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR Ed Richardson | Trustee | 29 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Simon Robert BREWER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.39k | £72.42k | £70.88k | £67.23k | £67.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.34k | £115.47k | £87.66k | £86.20k | £82.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 11TH JANUARY 1957 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 27 JANUARY 2005, 19 SEPTEMBER 2005 AND 12 DECEMBER 2005 AND 16 SEPTEMBER 2009 as amended on 16 Sept 2009
Charitable objects
A PREPARATORY SCHOOL FOR BOYS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Floor
River Court
Mill Lane
GODALMING
Surrey
GU7 1EZ
- Phone:
- 01483412060
- Email:
- nigelp@constantinegroup.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window