Financial history BRIGHTON COLLEGE

Charity number: 307061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £51.71m £54.12m £54.25m £53.93m £64.87m
Total expenditure £41.08m £43.78m £46.85m £46.80m £54.73m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £779.97k £436.96k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.84m £1.55m £1.68m £1.29m £3.55m
Income - Other trading activities £1.25m £1.35m £894.00k £522.59k £1.07m
Income - Charitable activities £48.19m £51.05m £51.60m £52.04m £60.02m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £165.00k £174.00k £79.00k £69.15k £236.01k
Income - Other £273.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £40.15m £42.65m £45.79m £46.39m £54.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £934.00k £1.13m £1.06m £412.30k £585.92k
Expenditure - Governance £57.00k £55.00k £37.00k £37.72k £19.61k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £135.88k £108.78k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0