Governing document BRIGHTON COLLEGE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/09/1873 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/03/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/06/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/04/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/04/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/06/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 APR 2016 as amended on 19 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A SOUND RELIGIOUS, CLASSICAL, MATHEMATICAL AND GENERAL EDUCATION, IN CONFORMITY WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.