Accounts and annual returns THE SIR ANDREW JUDD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 307099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 10 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 10 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 04 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 03 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 03 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 02 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 02 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window