JOHN POLLEN'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 307139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £122 £128 £140 £139 £728
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £600
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A