JOHN POLLEN'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 307139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR Christopher Gqwnn Trustee 01 June 2015
MISS GALES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
SUSAN ELIZABETH EVANS Trustee
MISS GALES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Sarah Watson Trustee 01 September 2019
MISS GALES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Rev Christopher Bradish Chair 13 March 2019
MISS GALES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Nick Matthews Trustee 12 June 2019
MISS GALES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Martin Boiles Trustee 01 December 2017 None on record