Accounts and annual returns FYFIELD OLD NATIONAL SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 307164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 February 2022 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 November 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 November 2020 385 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 January 2019 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required