Accounts and annual returns ST OSYTH SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1111865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 31 March 2021 274 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 January 2020 190 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required