Accounts and annual returns ARIA (SOUTHAMPTON) TRUST

Charity number: 307249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 July 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 October 2020 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 17 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required