Financial history ARIA (SOUTHAMPTON) TRUST

Charity number: 307249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £8.35k £8.09k £8.04k £8.21k £8.37k
Total expenditure £58 £0 £0 £0 £15.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A