THE SOUTHAMPTON POST-GRADUATE MEDICAL AND DENTAL FEDERATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and advance the study and general knowledge of medicine and science and all matters relating to the progress and development of all branches of dental and medical science. To enhance the co-operation between branches of these various sciences and the health services. To assist with patient and staff welfare and for the provision of medical and ancillary equipment and facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 07 May 1969: Standard registration
- THE SOUTHAMPTON POST-GRADUATE MEDICAL FEDERATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SHARON ELIZABETH FOLEY | Chair | 03 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID ROWEN | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Eugene Pius Healy | Trustee | 04 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr RAJUL PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.21k | £7.78k | £6.40k | £7.72k | £25.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.96k | £66.35k | £57.28k | £69.86k | £68.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 06 March 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
AMENDED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH FEBRUARY 1969
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE AND TO ADVANCE THE STUDY AND GENERAL KNOWLEDGE OF MEDICINE AND SCIENCE AND ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE PROGRESS AND DEVELOPMENT OF ALL BRANCHES OF MEDICAL, VETERINARY AND DENTAL SCIENCES AND IN PURSUANCE OF THESE AIMS. 2. TO ENHANCE THE CO-OPERATION BETWEEN BRANCHES OF THE VARIOUS SCIENCES INCLUDING THE HEALTH SERVICES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 EYNHAM AVENUE
SOUTHAMPTON
SO19 5LB
- Phone:
- 07703292273
- Email:
- spgmdf@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window