THE BENNETT MEMORIAL DIOCESAN SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the trust is to advance the education of pupils by making grants available to the school towards the improvement of teaching and learning. This last year grants have been awarded to support the Bennett Music Academy and the DoE Award Scheme. A ?500K grant has also been set aside for a new 6th Form Centre due to be ready in Jan 2014.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 02 April 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brenda Holden | Chair | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen White | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Barker | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ellery | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA TAYLOR | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.69k | £79.32k | £71.78k | £53.69k | £66.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.64k | £100.01k | £47.32k | £64.02k | £113.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 4TH MARCH 1997 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 24 SEP 2013 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 15 JUL 2015 as amended on 19 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING THE BENNETT MEMORIAL DIOCESAN SCHOOL TUNBRIDGE WELLS KENT BY MAKING PAYMENTS TO THE GOVERNING BODY OF THE SCHOOL AND OTHERS FOR SUCH PURPOSES AS THE MANAGING TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bennett Memorial Diocesan School
Culverden Down
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
Kent
TN4 9SH
- Phone:
- 01892521595
- Email:
- leigh@bennett.kent.sch.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window