BISHOP'S WALTHAM EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTE

Charity number: 307293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 April 2021 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required