BISHOP'S WALTHAM EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTE

Charity number: 307293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.72k £1.05k £1.81k £3.57k £0
Total expenditure £1.25k £4.43k £2.96k £6.60k £442.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A