THE PBC TRUST

Charity number: 1123723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 December 2019 07 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2018 07 February 2020 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2015 04 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2015 Not Required