Financial history FLITCHAM VILLAGE HALL AND COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1061261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £7.04k £4.42k £4.32k £14.99k £19.13k
Total expenditure £5.05k £4.33k £7.98k £5.82k £10.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £230
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £18.71k