NORTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1063062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £56.86k £26.92k £23.64k £56.81k £32.59k
Total expenditure £39.14k £38.48k £25.85k £50.97k £32.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £1.92k
Income from government grants £22.29k £5.34k £2.42k £5.41k £20.71k