CARERS TRUST BUCKS AND MILTON KEYNES

Charity number: 1106745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time Download