CARERS TRUST BUCKS AND MILTON KEYNES

Charity number: 1106745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.30m £1.31m £1.19m £1.01m £1.06m
Total expenditure £1.29m £1.30m £1.15m £1.05m £980.87k
Income from government contracts £1.06m £1.22m £817.84k £887.53k £820.92k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £12.15k
Income - Donations and legacies £42.65k £53.01k £65.22k £53.34k £55.29k
Income - Other trading activities £26.14k £37.63k £27.93k £55.26k £22.52k
Income - Charitable activities £1.20m £1.22m £1.06m £905.90k £985.84k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £119 £65 £96 £0 £0
Income - Other £30.59k £38 £7.50k £272 £0
Income - Legacies £21.88k £0 £29.43k £0 £30.68k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.29m £1.30m £1.15m £1.05m £979.58k
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.77k £2.29k £4.16k £943 £1.29k
Expenditure - Governance £5.34k £1.21k £0 £0 £8.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0