THE AYOT ST LAWRENCE FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds for restoring the Ayot St Lawrence Palladian Church and for charitable purposes within the Parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 17 June 1997: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE MONICA STEVENSON | Chair | 06 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Morrisey | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Taylor | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kitty Ann Turner | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Heathcote | Trustee | 16 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.07k | £5 | £45.01k | £61.67k | £64.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.15k | £548 | £33.50k | £46.99k | £66.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2024 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2024 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29TH MAY 1997
Charitable objects
TO RAISE FUNDS WHICH WILL BE UTILISED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES WITHIN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF AYOR ST. LAWRENCE IN THE COUNTY OF HERTFORDSHIRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT")
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Church Cottages
Ayot St. Lawrence
Welwyn
AL6 9BZ
- Phone:
- 07745607310
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window