THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST PETER, NEEDHAM

Charity number: 1064537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 March 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 March 2021 409 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 June 2019 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 04 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required