Trustees BILDESTON KINGS PIGHTLE TRUST
Charity number: 1065766
Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Marie Slater | Chair | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Dodson | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
William George Pratt | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Frank Neville Miller | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robin Michael Taylor | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Noakes | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Ann Talbott | Trustee | 02 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CHARLES LESTER | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.