Accounts and annual returns THE TABOR FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1061334
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 28 August 2009 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 28 August 2009 | 424 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 21 March 2007 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 14 February 2007 | 229 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window