ELIZABETH HUTCHINSON'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity makes grants to assist student, residents within Northill Parish between the ages of 16-25 who are in further education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 01 August 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Ernest Dawson | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Katie Hanlon | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Corbett | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|||||
STEPH WHITE | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Smith | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|||||
ANNA CAROLINE FRANKLIN | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|||||
PETER JOHN ONION | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.32k | £6.40k | £6.97k | £6.11k | £5.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.43k | £6.47k | £5.06k | £6.04k | £6.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 189 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 2ND 1728. SCHEME DATED 10TH DECEMBER 1963
Charitable objects
EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT ANY SECONDARY SCHOOL, TRAINING COLLEGE FOR TEACHERS, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER EDUCATION. ASSISTANCE ON ENTERING A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING. OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS OF EITHER SEX UNDER 25 YEARS OF AGE, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN WHO HAVE LOST ONE OR BOTH PARENTS.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF NORTHILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Shakespeare Drive
Upper Caldecote
BIGGLESWADE
SG18 9DD
- Phone:
- 01767318993
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window