Accounts and annual returns THE GARDENS OF EASTON LODGE PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1101442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 22 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 11 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 11 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2019 20 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 20 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 04 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2017 06 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 06 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window