Financial history THE GARDENS OF EASTON LODGE PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1101442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £37.88k £52.99k £56.89k £55.52k £47.04k
Total expenditure £27.85k £34.29k £41.47k £45.70k £55.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A