Trustees THE GARDENS OF EASTON LODGE PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1101442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angus Drever Chair 30 January 2014
None on record
Peter Robert Keeys Trustee 16 June 2022
None on record
Dame Elizabeth Gardiner DCB, QC Trustee 17 June 2019
THE CIVIL SERVICE RETIREMENT FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time
JILL ISOBEL GOLDSMITH Trustee 18 December 2015
None on record
Sue Gilbert Trustee 14 May 2015
None on record
CATHERINE MARY DEAN Trustee
STANSTED MOUNTFITCHET DAY AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time