ST ANDREW'S SCHOOL (BEDFORD) LIMITED

Charity number: 307531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.89m £1.87m £2.08m £2.11m £2.09m
Total expenditure £1.80m £1.87m £1.98m £1.94m £2.07m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £21.94k £27.88k £28.44k £15.56k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.87m £1.84m £2.05m £2.06m £2.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £21 £295 £1.10k £1.22k
Income - Other £25.69k £5.99k £6.48k £19.09k £4.09k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.80m £1.87m £1.98m £1.94m £2.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0