THE ALLENBY ENDOWMENT IN CONNECTION WITH CRAYFORD R C SCHOOL

Charity number: 307726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £222 £228 £240 £254 £267
Total expenditure £222 £228 £240 £254 £267
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A