NORTH LONDON MUSLIM COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1062409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £672.80k £741.40k £729.71k £703.41k £727.15k
Total expenditure £672.80k £741.40k £729.71k £703.41k £824.96k
Income from government contracts £456.62k £445.95k £445.42k £442.61k £438.07k
Income from government grants £54.88k £42.41k £26.08k £36.49k £24.59k
Income - Donations and legacies £420 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £198.51k £185.70k £194.00k £218.73k
Income - Charitable activities £522.63k £542.89k £544.01k £509.41k £508.42k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £149.75k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £473.83k £559.77k £480.94k £472.39k £500.01k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £198.97k £181.62k £248.77k £231.02k £324.95k