WHITTINGTON PARK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Whittington Park Community Association runs a busy, vibrant community centre in North Islington. Activities include a a 55 plus social club, a nursery and early years hub in the middle of the park, a Friday evening youth club plus a whole range of activities for all ages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £147,490 from 4 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Islington
Governance
- 04 May 2006: Standard registration
- 15 March 2011: Funds received from 1056497 WHITTINGTON PARK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COURTNEY SHAPIRO | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Graham Chapman | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Jeetendra Solanki | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JANE CHRISTINA RUDDOCK | Trustee | 06 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ghizela Modood | Trustee | 25 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN UDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COUNCILLOR JANET BURGESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH CASE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN PURCELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BEATRICE COKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £405.22k | £353.81k | £301.24k | £527.17k | £430.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £366.53k | £269.22k | £267.79k | £626.61k | £495.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £221.24k | £261.30k | £120.63k | £379.44k | £147.49k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £384.92k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £138.23k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £999 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.03k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £626.61k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.10k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/04/2004
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON THEREAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT' WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF THE WHITTINGTON PARK COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE IT (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHITTINGTON PARK COMMUNITY ASS.
YERBURY ROAD
LONDON
ISLINGTON
N19 4RS
- Phone:
- 02072721847
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window