NOAH'S ARK CHILDREN'S VENTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NACV provides high quality, low cost residential facilities for groups who work with children, young people and adults from disadvantaged backgrounds from the London Borough of Lewisham and elsewhere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
- Gloucestershire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 April 1997: Standard registration
- MACARONI WOOD (Working name)
- NOAH'S ARK CHILDRENS VENTURE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Newton-Alfred | Chair | 06 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Robinson | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Davidson | Trustee | 06 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Adam Hainsworth | Trustee | 06 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES EASTHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £198.86k | £209.17k | £161.69k | £216.93k | £286.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £225.20k | £190.24k | £217.90k | £237.42k | £321.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £40.00k | £15.33k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 NOVEMBER 2009. as amended on 28 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
2.1 The Charity's objects are restricted specifically only for the public benefit are the provision of facilities for the recreation and other leisure time occupation for children being facilities: (i) Of which children and others have need by reason of their youth, disability, poverty, or social and economic circumstances, (ii) Which will improve the conditions of life for such children and others by promoting their physical, mental and spiritual wellbeing, and (iii) To assist in such ways as the charity trustees think fit, any charity, social care or education organisation in the United Kingdom whose aims include the advancing of education of persons under the age of 25 years in conservation protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Noahs Ark Childrens Venture
5 Macaroni Wood
Eastleach
Cirencester
GL7 3NF
- Phone:
- 01367850356
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window