THE CEDARS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 307860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Derek Shanley Trustee 09 July 2020 None on record
Sara Patricia Denton Trustee 08 October 2020 None on record
Jane Greiller Trustee 09 July 2020 None on record
Rev Michael Anthony McLaughlin Trustee 30 January 2020 None on record
Victoria Penelope Shanley Trustee 09 July 2020 None on record
Dr Francis Clifford John Denton Chair 08 October 2020 None on record
Akinsola Akinyose Trustee 04 February 2016 None on record
Rev EDWARD MAURICE ALEXANDERSON WRIGHT Trustee 23 March 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WROTHAM Received: On time
INN CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES Received: On time